LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB911
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB911
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB911
Compare Versions
SB911 Chaptered September 28, 2014
SB911 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB911 Amended August 22, 2014
SB911 Amended August 19, 2014
SB911 Amended June 19, 2014
SB911 Amended May 27, 2014
SB911 Amended March 27, 2014
SB911 Amended March 4, 2014
SB911 Introduced January 23, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB911 Chaptered September 28, 2014
SB911 Enrolled September 2, 2014
SB911 Amended August 22, 2014
SB911 Amended August 19, 2014
SB911 Amended June 19, 2014
SB911 Amended May 27, 2014
SB911 Amended March 27, 2014
SB911 Amended March 4, 2014
SB911 Introduced January 23, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare