California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB936 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 14, 2014
Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014
Bill March 10, 2014