LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB936
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB936
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB936
Compare Versions
SB936 Chaptered September 19, 2014
SB936 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB936 Amended August 14, 2014
SB936 Amended August 4, 2014
SB936 Amended July 1, 2014
SB936 Amended June 11, 2014
SB936 Amended May 6, 2014
SB936 Amended April 21, 2014
SB936 Amended April 8, 2014
SB936 Amended March 10, 2014
SB936 Introduced February 3, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB936 Chaptered September 19, 2014
SB936 Enrolled August 21, 2014
SB936 Amended August 14, 2014
SB936 Amended August 4, 2014
SB936 Amended July 1, 2014
SB936 Amended June 11, 2014
SB936 Amended May 6, 2014
SB936 Amended April 21, 2014
SB936 Amended April 8, 2014
SB936 Amended March 10, 2014
SB936 Introduced February 3, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare