|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 246, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4397.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5706.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3187.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3093.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Corrected April 9.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|