California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB939 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 23, 2014
Bill May 21, 2014
Bill April 2, 2014