California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 15, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2014

Amended

Bill June 11, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014
Bill April 29, 2014
Bill March 10, 2014