LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB940
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB940
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB940
Compare Versions
SB940 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB940 Enrolled August 15, 2014
SB940 Amended June 11, 2014
SB940 Amended June 4, 2014
SB940 Amended April 29, 2014
SB940 Amended March 10, 2014
SB940 Introduced February 4, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB940 Chaptered September 25, 2014
SB940 Enrolled August 15, 2014
SB940 Amended June 11, 2014
SB940 Amended June 4, 2014
SB940 Amended April 29, 2014
SB940 Amended March 10, 2014
SB940 Introduced February 4, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare