California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB941 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2014

Amended

Bill August 18, 2014
Bill June 18, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014