LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB941
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB941
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB941
Compare Versions
SB941 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB941 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB941 Amended August 18, 2014
SB941 Amended June 18, 2014
SB941 Amended May 27, 2014
SB941 Amended April 22, 2014
SB941 Introduced February 4, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB941 Chaptered September 18, 2014
SB941 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB941 Amended August 18, 2014
SB941 Amended June 18, 2014
SB941 Amended May 27, 2014
SB941 Amended April 22, 2014
SB941 Introduced February 4, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare