|
09/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 369, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4878.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 6410.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6227.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3604.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3705.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3338.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. (Corrected April 11.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|