California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB949 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 28, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill June 26, 2014
Bill May 7, 2014
Bill April 8, 2014