California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB953 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 8, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2014

Amended

Bill May 1, 2014
Bill April 21, 2014