LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB953
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB953
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB953
Compare Versions
SB953 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB953 Enrolled August 8, 2014
SB953 Amended May 1, 2014
SB953 Amended April 21, 2014
SB953 Introduced February 6, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB953 Chaptered August 15, 2014
SB953 Enrolled August 8, 2014
SB953 Amended May 1, 2014
SB953 Amended April 21, 2014
SB953 Introduced February 6, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare