|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4400.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5915.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3698.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2014
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3278.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2014
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|