California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB960 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 19, 2014
Bill May 28, 2014
Bill April 22, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014