|
08/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 275, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4400.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 5908.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5847.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 8. Page 3415.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 3243.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3244.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3078.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2014
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|