California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB962 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill July 1, 2014
Bill June 12, 2014
Bill June 2, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014
Bill March 24, 2014