|
09/30/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 922, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 9. Page 4687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 25. Page 6251.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 3657.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3235.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3092.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2014
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|