LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB968
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB968
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB968
Compare Versions
SB968 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB968 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB968 Amended August 18, 2014
SB968 Amended June 30, 2014
SB968 Amended June 9, 2014
SB968 Amended May 27, 2014
SB968 Amended April 9, 2014
SB968 Introduced February 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB968 Chaptered September 30, 2014
SB968 Enrolled August 25, 2014
SB968 Amended August 18, 2014
SB968 Amended June 30, 2014
SB968 Amended June 9, 2014
SB968 Amended May 27, 2014
SB968 Amended April 9, 2014
SB968 Introduced February 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare