|
09/30/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4756.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6301.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6162.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3650.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3706.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2014
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2014
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2014
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|