California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB969 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill May 27, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014