|
09/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2417.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2372.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Page 2372.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3294.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2941.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 10.) (August 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 898.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).
|
|
|