California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB97 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2013

Amended

Bill September 11, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 28, 2013