|
07/21/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/21/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4254.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 5620.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5546.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3465.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3343.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3266.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2014
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|