California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB972 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2014

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2014

Chaptered

Bill July 21, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014