|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 248, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4401.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5913.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2014
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3256.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2014
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|