California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB997 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill April 7, 2014