|
05/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2013-14 First Extraordinary Session.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 60.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 93.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 18.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (February 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (February 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Set for hearing February 21 in APPR. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Set for hearing February 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|