LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SBX12
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SBX12
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SBX12
Compare Versions
SBX12 Chaptered May 9, 2013
SBX12 Enrolled April 30, 2013
SBX12 Amended April 1, 2013
SBX12 Amended March 21, 2013
SBX12 Amended March 7, 2013
SBX12 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SBX12 Chaptered May 9, 2013
SBX12 Enrolled April 30, 2013
SBX12 Amended April 1, 2013
SBX12 Amended March 21, 2013
SBX12 Amended March 7, 2013
SBX12 Introduced January 28, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare