California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2014

Amended

Bill June 16, 2014
Bill June 4, 2014