LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR113
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR113
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR113
Compare Versions
SCR113 Chaptered August 13, 2014
SCR113 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SCR113 Amended June 16, 2014
SCR113 Amended June 4, 2014
SCR113 Introduced April 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SCR113 Chaptered August 13, 2014
SCR113 Enrolled August 12, 2014
SCR113 Amended June 16, 2014
SCR113 Amended June 4, 2014
SCR113 Introduced April 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare