Senate | 08/13/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Senate | 08/11/2014 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4398.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2014 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5814.) Ordered to the Senate. (Corrected July 28.) | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2014 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24). | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3782.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected June 11.) |