California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 13, 2014

Amended

Bill July 3, 2014
Bill June 30, 2014