Senate | 09/05/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Senate | 09/05/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2014 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4868.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6423.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 21). | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 08/07/2014 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4358.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2014 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |