California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR137 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/05/2014

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 137CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 150 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 5, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 26, 2014 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 25, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 14, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Senator Walters (Coauthors: Senators Correa, Huff, and Wyland) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Allen, Daly, Hagman, Harkey, Mansoor, Quirk-Silva, and Wagner) AUGUST 4, 2014 Relative to National Child Awareness Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 137, Walters. National Child Awareness Month. This measure would recognize the month of September 2014 as National Child Awareness Month in California to honor children's charities, youth-serving organizations, and other nongovernmental organizations that are committed to enriching and bettering the lives of children and youth in California and the rest of the country. WHEREAS, Numerous individuals, children's organizations, and youth-serving organizations that work with children and youth on a daily basis provide invaluable services that serve to enrich and better the lives of children and youth; and WHEREAS, By strengthening and supporting children's and youth-serving charities and other similar nongovernmental organizations, and by encouraging greater collaboration among these organizations, the lives of many more children may be improved and enriched; and WHEREAS, Heightening people's awareness of, and increasing the support for, charitable and nonprofit organizations in the state that provide access to health care, social services, education, the arts, sports, and other services to children and youth will help to better the lives of those children and youth; and WHEREAS, September is a time when parents, families, teachers, school administrators, and others increase their focus on preparing children and youth for the future as they begin a new school year and it is a time for the people of this state to highlight, and be mindful of, the needs of children and youth; and WHEREAS, Children's charities, youth-serving organizations, and other nongovernmental organizations across California and the rest of the country should be recognized for the work they do to improve the lives, and promote the well-being of, children and youth in this state and country; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes the month of September 2014 as National Child Awareness Month in California to honor children's charities, youth-serving organizations, and other nongovernmental organizations that are committed to enriching and bettering the lives of children and youth in California and the rest of the country; and that public officials and citizens of California are encouraged to observe the month with appropriate activities and programs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.