LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR14
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR14
Compare Versions
SCR14 Chaptered May 8, 2013
SCR14 Enrolled May 6, 2013
SCR14 Amended April 25, 2013
SCR14 Amended March 19, 2013
SCR14 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SCR14 Chaptered May 8, 2013
SCR14 Enrolled May 6, 2013
SCR14 Amended April 25, 2013
SCR14 Amended March 19, 2013
SCR14 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare