California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR14 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/08/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 14CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 27 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 8, 2013 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 6, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk (Coauthors: Assembly Members Williams, Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Atkins, Bigelow, Bloom, Blumenfield, Bocanegra, Bonilla, Bonta, Bradford, Brown, Buchanan, Ian Calderon, Campos, Chau, Chvez, Chesbro, Conway, Cooley, Dahle, Daly, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eggman, Fong, Fox, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Garcia, Gatto, Gomez, Gordon, Gorell, Gray, Grove, Hagman, Hall, Harkey, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Levine, Linder, Logue, Maienschein, Mansoor, Medina, Melendez, Mitchell, Morrell, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nestande, Olsen, Pan, Patterson, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Salas, Skinner, Stone, Ting, Torres, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wieckowski, Wilk, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 22, 2013 Relative to California Library Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 14, Wolk. California Library Week. This measure would declare April 14, 2013, to April 20, 2013, inclusive, as California Library Week. WHEREAS, California Library Week seeks to partner with the efforts surrounding National Library Week, which is being celebrated in public libraries throughout the United States from April 14, 2013, to April 20, 2013, inclusive; and WHEREAS, More than 21 million people use California's public libraries each year; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries are dynamic places, offering books, computers, Internet access, email reference, e-books, and other innovative services to connect their users with ideas and information; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries are valued community centers providing education, information, knowledge, and entertainment; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries and librarians advance teaching and learning by helping students, faculty, seniors, veterans, researchers, and other members of the general public obtain the best, most accurate, and complete information; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries provide equal and economical services to library users, and in many cases, serve as a community's only point of access to resources for learning; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries provide technology training and help to bridge the digital divide for those who do not have access to technology at home or at school; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries change lives by serving over 20,000 adults annually through customized literacy services delivered primarily through trained volunteers, who contribute over 750,000 hours annually to assist adults in learning how to read; and WHEREAS, The students of California are a rapidly growing group of library users, visiting the state's public libraries after school and on weekends for homework assistance and for materials to use in school assignments; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries are important community educational resources, providing books and innovative programs and services such as preschool literacy readiness, Toddler Times, the Summer Reading Program, Grandparents and Books, and Reach Out and Read in conjunction with pediatric clinics; and WHEREAS, This year the California State Library will be celebrating its 163rd year of providing technical assistance and consultation to California's public libraries, and preserving and hosting an abundance of California's priceless historical items; and WHEREAS, California's public libraries preserve our cultural heritage, inform our present, and inspire our future; now, therefore, be it Resolved, by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares the week of April 14, 2013, to April 20, 2013, inclusive, as California Library Week, and commends California's public libraries, librarians, and all library workers for enriching the lives of California residents and helping to make our state an exceptional place to live, learn, and work; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.