California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR16 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2013

Enrolled

Bill April 4, 2013

Chaptered

Bill April 8, 2013

Amended

Bill April 1, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013