California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR16 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 04/08/2013

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 16CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 13 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE APRIL 8, 2013 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 4, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 1, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 1, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Knight (Coauthors: Senators Anderson, Berryhill, Block, Cannella, Corbett, Correa, Emmerson, Fuller, Gaines, Huff, Jackson, Lieu, Nielsen, Pavley, Price, Steinberg, Walters, Wright, and Wyland) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Conway, Donnelly, Gorell, Hall, Maienschein, Muratsuchi, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Bigelow, Bloom, Blumenfield, Bocanegra, Bonilla, Bonta, Bradford, Brown, Buchanan, Ian Calderon, Campos, Chau, Chvez, Chesbro, Cooley, Dahle, Dickinson, Eggman, Fong, Fox, Frazier, Beth Gaines, Garcia, Gatto, Gordon, Grove, Harkey, Roger Hernndez, Holden, Jones, Jones-Sawyer, Levine, Linder, Logue, Mansoor, Medina, Mitchell, Morrell, Mullin, Nazarian, Nestande, Olsen, Pan, Patterson, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Rendon, Salas, Skinner, Stone, Torres, Wagner, Waldron, Weber, Wieckowski, Wilk, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 27, 2013 Relative to aerospace. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 16, Knight. California Aerospace Month. This measure would recognize the contributions of the aerospace industry to the history, economy, security, and educational system of California, its communities, and its citizens by proclaiming the month of March 2013 as California Aerospace Month. WHEREAS, The California aerospace industry is a powerful, reliable source of employment, innovation, and export income, directly employing more than 162,000 people in California and supporting more than 640,000 jobs in related fields for a total payroll estimated at $15.3 billion annually and resulting in $500 million in annual state income taxes; and WHEREAS, The California aerospace industry leads the United States in aerospace and defense services, including the design and manufacture of aircraft, spacecraft, and commercial satellites, as well as a myriad of systems and instruments for search, detection, navigation, guidance, and radio and television broadcast and wireless communication systems; and WHEREAS, California is home to many superb sites of air and space activity, including Vandenberg Air Force Base, two Federal Aviation Administration-licensed launch sites, the Mojave Air and Spaceport, more than 20 astronomical observatories, multiple international airports, many important defense aerospace bases, and hundreds of business and general aviation airfields; and WHEREAS, California is also home to three National Aeronautics and Space Administration (NASA) research and engineering centers. These centers are recognized as the Ames Research Center, the Dryden Flight Research Center, and the Jet Propulsion Laboratory (JPL); and WHEREAS, California has led the nation in aeronautical firsts and California's aerospace industry produced many of the significant and record-breaking aircraft that are now represented in The Smithsonian Institution's National Air and Space Museum. The Spirit of St. Louis, which in 1927 performed the first solo nonstop transatlantic flight from New York to Paris, was designed and built in California by Ryan Airlines and made Charles Lindbergh an international hero. The Douglas DC-3, recognized as the most successful airliner in history, dominating both commercial and military air transportation from its introduction in 1935 until after World War II, was designed and built in California by the Douglas Aircraft Company. The Space Shuttle was designed, built, assembled, and tested in California. California is home to Edwards Air Force Base, the site of five test flights of the Shuttle Enterprise, the landing site of 54 Space Shuttle missions, and the site of the 199 X-15 missions; and WHEREAS, Edwards Air Force Base, known for its notable aeronautical achievements, was the location of many first flights of American aircraft, shuttles, and jets flown from Rogers Dry Lake in the Mojave Desert of Kern County. America's first jet, XP-59A, was first flown in California. General Charles "Chuck" Yeager made world history in California on October 14, 1947, when he became the first man to fly Mach 1, faster than the speed of sound, while piloting the Bell X-1 rocket plane. The rocket powered X-15, flown by former State Senator William J. "Pete" Knight, attained a speed of Mach 6.7 (4,520 miles per hour), a speed that remains, to this day, the highest ever attained in an airplane. The Rutan Model 76 Voyager was the first aircraft to fly around the world without stopping or refueling; and WHEREAS, California has led the nation in firsts in human space exploration, including the manufacture of the Apollo 11 command module that carried the first humans to the surface of our moon; the manufacture and landing of the Space Shuttle orbiters, the first reusable space vehicles, which include the Endeavour, on display at the California Science Center; and the manufacture and recovery of the SpaceX Dragon capsule and Falcon launch vehicle, the first privately funded space exploration system; and WHEREAS, California has led the nation in firsts in robotic space exploration, including the Explorer 1 Earth observation satellite as America's first successful spacecraft, the Mariner 2 as the first spacecraft to explore another planet, the Viking landers as the first spacecrafts to perform experiments on another planet, and the development of the Pioneer 10 spacecraft as the first to exit our solar system; and WHEREAS, Californians, through NASA and JPL, build, manage, and operate the majority of the spacecraft exploring our solar system, including the most recent Mars Science Laboratory "Curiosity," and those spacecraft exploring other solar systems, like the Kepler exoplanet discovery mission, as well as the SOFIA, the Stratospheric Observatory for Infrared Astronomy that administers the Airborne Astronomy Ambassadors program for educators who have inspired the dreams of California youth; and WHEREAS, California aerospace industries assemble the legendary Boeing C-17 Globemaster III, build the impressive Northrop Grumman Global Hawk Unmanned Aircraft Systems, engineer radical new aircraft at the famous Lockheed Martin "Skunk Works" Advanced Development Programs facility, and create systems that assist and protect members of the United States Armed Forces through military communications, situational awareness, satellite-guided ordnance, and technologies yet to be dreamed of; and WHEREAS, California will continue to lead in aerospace education, through its superb Science, Technology, Engineering and Mathematics (STEM) education programs and at its world-class research universities, and thus will continue to lead the world with the innovation that enabled advanced meteorological forecasting, the Global Positioning System, NextGen tools for air traffic management, green aviation, sophisticated wind tunnels and test facilities, and advanced supercomputing and robotics; and WHEREAS, The American Institute of Aeronautics and Astronautics (AIAA), in conjunction with NASA, is sponsoring a month of events to highlight the contributions of the aerospace community to California, including panel discussions, educational displays, tours, and the "AIAA Policy Symposium: Civilian Applications of Unmanned Aerial Vehicles (UAVs) - A California Perspective," during March 2013; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the California Legislature recognizes the contributions of the aerospace industry to the history, economy, security, and educational system of California, its communities, and its citizens by proclaiming the month of March 2013 as California Aerospace Month; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.