BILL NUMBER: SCR 38INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Senator Hueso APRIL 18, 2013 Relative to the Stephen Palmer Sr. Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 38, as introduced, Hueso. Stephen Palmer Sr. Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 94 in the County of San Diego as the Stephen Palmer Sr. Memorial Highway. This measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering those costs, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Caltrans Imperial Landscape Crew member Stephen Palmer Sr. was born to Robert and Dorothea Palmer on November 24, 1946, in Lima, Peru, and served in the United States Navy from July 21, 1964, to November 22, 1967; and WHEREAS, On November 26, 1975, Stephen Palmer Sr. married his wife, Bertha Rios, a native of San Diego; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer Sr. began working for the Department of Transportation (Caltrans) in 2007, where he quickly worked his way into playing an integral role and became a proud member of District 11's Imperial Landscape Crew; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer Sr. died from injuries sustained after being struck by a trolley car in the National City area of San Diego, while on the job, on May 4, 2011; and WHEREAS, Now, at the maintenance yard where the Imperial Landscape Crew gets together, the chair where Stephen sat stands empty, serving as a reminder of how precious life is, and bringing to mind the man who gave his life serving the citizens of California; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer Sr. treasured his family and did all he possibly could for each and every one of them; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer Sr. was 64 years old and is survived by his wife, Bertha, their sons, Stephen Jr., who also works for District 11 Maintenance, Richard Asperin, and Gilbert Asperin, daughter, Sherry Yafuso, sisters, Judy, Clare, and Mary, brothers, Bob, Paul, and David, and 13 grandchildren; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Stephen Palmer Sr.'s great contributions, service, and sacrifice in service of Caltrans and the citizens of California, it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 94 in the County of San Diego in honor of Stephen Palmer Sr.; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 94 between Old Campo Road and Melody Road in the County of San Diego as the Stephen Palmer Sr. Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.