BILL NUMBER: SCR 38CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 3 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE FEBRUARY 3, 2014 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY JANUARY 29, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2013 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 12, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hueso (Coauthor: Senator Anderson) APRIL 18, 2013 Relative to the Stephen Palmer, Sr., Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 38, Hueso. Stephen Palmer, Sr., Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 94 in the County of San Diego as the Stephen Palmer, Sr., Memorial Highway. This measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering those costs, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, Caltrans Imperial Landscape Crew member Stephen Palmer, Sr., was born to Robert and Dorothea Palmer on November 24, 1946, in Lima, Peru, and served in the United States Navy from July 21, 1964, to November 22, 1967; and WHEREAS, On November 26, 1975, Stephen Palmer, Sr., married his wife, Bertha Rios, a native of San Diego; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer, Sr., began working for the Department of Transportation (Caltrans) in 2007, where he quickly worked his way into playing an integral role and became a proud member of Caltrans District 11's Imperial Landscape Crew; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer, Sr., died from injuries sustained after being struck by a trolley car in the National City area of San Diego while on the job on May 4, 2011; and WHEREAS, Now, at the maintenance yard where the Caltrans Imperial Landscape Crew gathers, the chair where Stephen Palmer, Sr., sat stands empty, serving as a reminder of how precious life is, and bringing to mind the man who gave his life serving the citizens of California; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer, Sr., treasured his family and did all he possibly could for each and every one of them; and WHEREAS, Stephen Palmer, Sr., was 64 years old and is survived by his wife, Bertha, their sons, Stephen Palmer, Jr., who also works for Caltrans District 11 Maintenance, Richard Asperin, and Gilbert Asperin, daughter, Sherry Yafuso, sisters, Judy, Clare, and Mary, brothers, Bob, Paul, and David, and 13 grandchildren; and WHEREAS, In recognition of Stephen Palmer, Sr.'s, great contributions, service, and sacrifice in service of Caltrans and the citizens of California, it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 94 in the County of San Diego in honor of Stephen Palmer, Sr.; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 94 between Old Campo Road and Melody Road in the County of San Diego as the Stephen Palmer, Sr., Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.