California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR38 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 18, 2013

Enrolled

Bill January 30, 2014

Chaptered

Bill February 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 12, 2013