Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2482.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 580.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 391.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2012
|
Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|