LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR4
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR4
Compare Versions
SCR4 Chaptered August 15, 2013
SCR4 Enrolled August 13, 2013
SCR4 Amended March 6, 2013
SCR4 Amended February 12, 2013
SCR4 Introduced December 6, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SCR4 Chaptered August 15, 2013
SCR4 Enrolled August 13, 2013
SCR4 Amended March 6, 2013
SCR4 Amended February 12, 2013
SCR4 Introduced December 6, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare