California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR43 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 3, 2013