LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR43
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR43
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR43
Compare Versions
SCR43 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SCR43 Enrolled September 4, 2013
SCR43 Amended August 22, 2013
SCR43 Amended August 6, 2013
SCR43 Amended August 5, 2013
SCR43 Amended June 3, 2013
SCR43 Introduced May 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SCR43 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SCR43 Enrolled September 4, 2013
SCR43 Amended August 22, 2013
SCR43 Amended August 6, 2013
SCR43 Amended August 5, 2013
SCR43 Amended June 3, 2013
SCR43 Introduced May 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare