Senate | 09/06/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 100, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:45 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/30/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2043.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2013 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2715.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Read third time and amended. (Page 2607.) Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 12). | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 1682.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |