BILL NUMBER: SCR 56CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 100 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 6, 2013 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 30, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 26, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Senator Torres (Coauthors: Senators Block, Fuller, and Pavley) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bocanegra, Brown, Frazier, Hall, Maienschein, Perea, Rendon, Salas, and Skinner) JUNE 25, 2013 Relative to National Night Out. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 56, Torres. National Night Out. This measure would proclaim August 6, 2013, as National Night Out in California and would urge the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out. WHEREAS, On August 6, 2013, the National Association of Town Watch is joining with law enforcement agencies, communities, and business organizations throughout the nation to sponsor the 30th Annual National Night Out, a unique, nationwide, crime prevention program; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is an evening for America to stand together and promote awareness, safety, and neighborhood unity; and WHEREAS, National Night Out is designed to heighten crime prevention awareness; generate support for, and participation in, local anticrime efforts; strengthen neighborhood spirit and police-community partnerships; and send a message to criminals, letting them know that neighborhoods are organized and fighting back; and WHEREAS, On August 6, 2013, residents in neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation are asked to join together to spend the evening outside with their neighbors and police; and WHEREAS, Many neighborhoods throughout California and across the nation will be hosting a variety of special events on August 6, 2013, such as block parties, cookouts, parades, visits from police, flashlight walks, safety demonstrations, contests, youth activities, and anticrime rallies; and WHEREAS, National Night Out has proven to be an effective, inexpensive, and enjoyable program to promote neighborhood unity and encourage strong relationships between local community members and law enforcement agencies that will help to strengthen community safety throughout the entire year; and WHEREAS, National Night Out highlights the vital importance that citizen involvement has in our fight for a safer state and nation; and WHEREAS, Over 37 million people from over 15,000 communities from all 50 states, United States territories, Canadian cities, and military bases worldwide participated in National Night Out in 2012; and WHEREAS, National Night Out provides a unique opportunity for California to recognize the thousands of communities across the state and country promoting cooperative, police-community crime prevention efforts; and WHEREAS, It is essential that all people of California be aware of the importance of crime prevention programs and the impact that their participation can have on reducing crime; and WHEREAS, All people should be encouraged to join with their neighbors, local police and sheriff's departments, and the National Association of Town Watch in supporting the 30th Annual National Night Out; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims August 6, 2013, as National Night Out in California and urges the people of California to observe and participate in National Night Out; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.