Senate | 08/29/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 93, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1950.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/20/2013 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2013 | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2608.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 15). | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2013 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1684.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |