California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR58 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill July 1, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 29, 2013

Amended

Bill August 19, 2013
Bill August 13, 2013